+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Co-author authorized
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor