+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor