+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (69)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Conference committee report filed
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor