+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor