+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/1/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor