+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor