+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Record vote
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor