+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor