+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate