+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor