+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/20/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor