+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor