+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor