+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 20, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor