+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Printing rule suspended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as amended
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered not printed
- Printing rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor