+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate