+ − Actions (35)
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor