+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/8/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Property Tax
- Read first time
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor