+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor