+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor