+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Point of order sustained
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/1/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 2/12/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor