+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate