+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed