+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (4)
Patrick, Diane
Type:
Primary Sponsor