+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor