+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor