+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor