+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted
- Read
- Laid before the Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor