+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Filed