+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed