+ − Actions (32)
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Health & Human Services
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Filed