+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed