+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor