+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed