+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed