+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Recalled from subcommittee
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor