+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (97)
Type:
Primary Sponsor