+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor