+ − Actions (52)
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Passed
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
- Read first time
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
- Filed
- Record vote
- Permission to introduce