+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 9, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor