+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor