+ − Actions (10)
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor