+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed