+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor