+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Adopted
- Record vote
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/12/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor