+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Adopted
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
- Laid before the House
- Adopted
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed