+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor