+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Adopted
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Adopted
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor