+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/31/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor