+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed